Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 24
Status as of February 1, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Status as of April 10, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 75
Status as of May 2, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 368
Status as of March 20, 2012: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Environmental Matters
Status as of March 20, 2012: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters
Status as of April 5, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings
Status as of March 20, 2012: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Health and Government Operations
Status as of May 2, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 294
Status as of May 2, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 415
Status as of February 14, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading Judiciary
Status as of April 6, 2012: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Appropriations
Status as of February 9, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Budget and Taxation
Status as of February 8, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of May 22, 2012: Vetoed by the Governor - Duplicative
Status as of March 19, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings
Status as of March 21, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Finance
Status as of April 10, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 74
Status as of February 8, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 7, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Status as of May 2, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 293
Status as of March 16, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 29, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 21, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of April 5, 2012: Bill is in the House - Second Reading Passed