Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Statutes Text

Article - State Personnel and Pensions




§26–204.

    (a)    Except as provided in subsection (b) of this section, a member’s contribution rate is:

        (1)    4% of the member’s earnable compensation received before July 1, 2011;

        (2)    6% of the member’s earnable compensation received from July 1, 2011 to June 30, 2012, both inclusive; and

        (3)    7% of the member’s earnable compensation received on or after July 1, 2012.

    (b)    (1)    This subsection applies only to a member who:

            (i)    transferred to the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System from the Employees’ Retirement System on or after January 1, 2001, and on or before December 31, 2004; or

            (ii)    1.    transferred to the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System from the Employees’ Retirement System on or before December 31, 2000; and

                2.    did not elect to participate in the Law Enforcement Officers’ Modified Pension Benefit on or before December 31, 2000 as provided in § 26-211 of this subtitle.

        (2)    The contribution rate for a member who has transferred from the Employees’ Retirement System is the rate set under:

            (i)    Section 22-214(a) of this article, for a member who had elected Selection A (Additional member contributions) under § 22-219 of this article; or

            (ii)    Section 22-214(b) of this article, for a member who had elected Selection B (Limited cost-of-living adjustment) under § 22-220 of this article.