Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Fire Department - Motorized Fire Equipment - Report
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore City Fire Department to report every 2 years to the members of the Baltimore City Delegation to the General Assembly on the condition of motorized fire equipment of the Department and the anticipated needs of the Department for motorized fire equipment for the following 2 years.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/16/2016
Legislative Date
6/16/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City Fire Department - Motorized Fire Equipment - Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City Fire Department - Motorized Fire Equipment - Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City Fire Department - Motorized Fire Equipment - Report
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/16/2016 6/16/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore City Fire Department - Motorized Fire Equipment - Report
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Baltimore City Fire Department - Motorized Fire Equipment - Report
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City Fire Department - Motorized Fire Equipment - Report
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM