Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing specified organizations in Anne Arundel County to conduct a card game, card tournament, or casino event under specified circumstances; requiring an organization to obtain a permit from the County Department of Inspections and Permits; specifying that a permit holder may receive no more than one permit per calendar year; requiring a participant in specified gaming events to be at least 21 years of age; requiring an individual who volunteers as an operator of specified gaming events to be at least 18 years of age; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0764 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {935564/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {669632/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments {935564/1 Adopted 38
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 40
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 40
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {669632/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-401, 13-404, 13-404.1, 13-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM