Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - In-State Tuition
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington, Wilkins, Acevero, Bagnall, Barron, Bridges, Cain, Charles, Fennell, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hettleman, Ivey, Kaiser, Lehman, J. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Sample-Hughes, Valderrama, Wells, and Solomon
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making a certain applicant eligible for senatorial and delegate scholarships if the applicant is eligible for in-State tuition.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {294269/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {863121/2 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (40-89)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-50)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {964537/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {964537/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {953722/3 (Senator Simonaire)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Motion to Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Ferguson) Adopted (34-9)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {213127/1 (Senator Simonaire) Withdrawn
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-49)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - In-State Tuition
House 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {294269/1 Adopted 31
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Floor Amendment {863121/2 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (40-89) 31
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - In-State Tuition
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (91-50) 33
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {964537/1 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {964537/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {953722/3 (Senator Simonaire) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Motion to Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Ferguson) Adopted (34-9) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {213127/1 (Senator Simonaire) Withdrawn 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (87-49) 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - In-State Tuition
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - In-State Tuition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-401, 18-402, 18-406, 18-406.1, 18-501, 18-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM