Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law relating to the Board of Review of the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; repealing provisions of law that require the Board of Review to make specified recommendations to the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene, advise the Secretary on specified matters, hear and determine specified appeals, and report at specified intervals to the Secretary; providing that a specified petitioner may not be charged a fee for specified costs under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017, January 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {826681/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {826681/1 Adopted 41
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 43
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Rules 42
Senate 3/16/2017 3/17/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Text - Chapter - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-633, 10-807, 15-108, 19-128, 19-227, 19-325, 19-345.1, 2-104, 21-317, 21-419, 2-201 through 2-207, 7-504, 7-801 )
(   1-101, 12-601, 14-5A-17.1, 14-5B-14.1, 14-5D-15, 14-5E-17, 15-315 )
(   10-215, 10-222 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM