Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $1,002,385,000, the proceeds to be used for specified necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring specified real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to specified subdivisions and other organizations for specified development and improvement purposes, subject to specified requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0191
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016, June 1, 2017, June 1, 2018, June 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
(   2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page