Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Business or Occupational Licenses - Administrative Penalties
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 85
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to suspend a business or occupational license before holding an administrative hearing if the Administration determines that the license holder is in violation of certain used vehicle safety inspection requirements and that there is a danger of immediate, substantial, and continuing harm to the public if the license is continued pending a hearing; requiring the Administration to grant a hearing request on the license suspension within 7 days of the request; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 85
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Business or Occupational Licenses - Administrative Penalties
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Business or Occupational Licenses - Administrative Penalties
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Rules 38
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 85
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Business or Occupational Licenses - Administrative Penalties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:16 PM