Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 4:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each official custodian to adopt a policy of proactive disclosure of public records; requiring each official custodian to publish by July 1 each year a report on a certain website on the requests received in the preceding year for inspection of public records; requiring each official custodian to store the report in a place easily accessible to the public if a website is not available; requiring the Public Information Act Compliance Board to receive, review, and resolve certain complaints from applicants; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0449
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/08/2020
Legislative Date
9/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 9/08/2020 9/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act)
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 4:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/16/2021 10:49 AM
Click to return on the top page