Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Waldstreicher
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 773
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified persons from distributing tobacco products, paraphernalia, or coupons to a minor; providing that a person who violates a specified provision of the Act is subject to civil penalties; providing that a conviction for a violation of specified provisions of law precludes a proceeding for a specified civil penalty arising out of the same violation; providing that enforcement of a specified civil penalty precludes a prosecution for a violation of specified provisions of law arising out of the same violation; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1504 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-18)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {887572/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-10)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 773
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (120-18) 43
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Finance 42
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {887572/1 Adopted 57
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (129-10) 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 773
Text - Chapter - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-107, 10-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM