Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the spouse of a person on trial for a crime may be compelled to testify as an adverse witness if the spouse and the person on trial married after the date on which the alleged crime for which the person is on trial occurred.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0064 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/18/2020
Legislative Date
9/18/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-11)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/18/2020 9/18/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (121-11) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 3/04/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page