Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - First-Degree Child Abuse - Continuing Course of Conduct
Sponsored by
Delegate Atterbeary
Status
In the House - Favorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing as first-degree child abuse three or more acts that constitute second-degree child abuse committed as a continuing course of conduct; and applying certain penalties.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0505
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/09/2020
Legislative Date
10/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - First-Degree Child Abuse - Continuing Course of Conduct
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/09/2020 10/09/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - First-Degree Child Abuse - Continuing Course of Conduct
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
Last Updated: 2/24/2021 9:19 PM
Click to return on the top page