Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Failure to Pay Video Toll – Outstanding Fines
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing to $25 the penalty for outstanding civil citations for video toll violations assessed on or before July 1, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0434
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Failure to Pay Video Toll – Outstanding Fines
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Failure to Pay Video Toll – Outstanding Fines
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page