Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Atterbeary, W. Fisher, Lehman, McComas, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies; to identify and study all State efforts to combat driving while under the influence of drugs and alcohol to include a review of national best practices and new technologies; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; terminating the Act after June 30, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1204 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM