Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License
Sponsored by
Delegate Reilly
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an assisted living program beer, wine, and liquor license in Harford County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue the license to a manager of an assisted living program, but not more than five ALP licenses to a person; authorizing the license holder to provide beer and wine for on-premises consumption by a resident or guest; authorizing the license holder to store liquor, prepare mixed drinks, and serve liquor or mixed drinks; specifying a license fee of $3,500; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0386
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0962 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/05/2020
Legislative Date
10/05/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653199/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/05/2020 10/05/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Favorable with Amendments {653199/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:31 PM
Click to return on the top page