Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to establish a Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program to provide loans to residential customers to finance the replacement of malfunctioning pipes; requiring the Program to include a requirement regarding notification or certification of an active leak; requiring that the replacement of specified pipes be performed by a plumber licensed by the Commission; requiring the Program to provide loans on a first- come, first-served basis; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1552 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {760612/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {760612/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM