Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Haynes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Human Resources to establish the Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program in the Department of Human Resources; requiring the Program to be established for 100 couples in at least three counties in the State; requiring the Secretary to cooperate with specified persons on the establishment of the Program; requiring the implementation of specified policies and procedures in local departments of social services; requiring the Secretary to report on the Program annually to committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244960/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-4)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {244960/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-4) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Finance 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-318.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM