Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Kerr
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a county board of education and authorizing a nonpublic school, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, to require two school employees to be trained in recognizing the signs and symptoms of a seizure, administering first aid, and administering or assisting with the administration of seizure medication and performing manual vagus nerve stimulation; authorizing a certain registered nurse to serve as a certain trained school employee; providing a certain employee is immune from civil liability under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0225
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0675 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/26/2020
Legislative Date
8/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/26/2020 8/26/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Text - First - Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   7-447 )
Last Updated: 1/22/2021 1:02 PM