Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Employment of Retirees - Required Break in Service
Sponsored by
Delegate Griffith (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified retired members of the State Retirement and Pension System from being employed on a permanent, temporary, or contractual basis by specified employers within 45 days of the date the individual retired; deleting obsolete provisions; making clarifying changes; providing for the effective date of specified provisions of the Act; and providing for the termination of specified provisions of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0477
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494665/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate McDermott) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {489334/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {494665/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate McDermott) Adopted 30
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 33
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 32
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {489334/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-406, 23-407, 24-405.1, 25-403, 26-403, 27-406, 28-402, 29-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM