Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified individual to request that a State's Attorney certify that a conviction was made in error under specified circumstances; providing that an individual is eligible for a specified grant from the Board of Public Works if a State's Attorney has certified that the individual's conviction was made in error; establishing the Task force to Study Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment; requiring the Task Force to report its finding to the Governor and General Assembly by December 15, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0348
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {952717/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-47)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-4)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Gubernatorial Pardon Requirement - Repeal
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {952717/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (88-47) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (42-4) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800
Text - Chapter - State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM