Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Barve, Ciliberti, Ebersole, Folden, Frush, Gaines, Gibson, Hill, C. Howard, Jalisi, Korman, Krimm, R. Lewis, McIntosh, Morhaim, Proctor, Tarlau, Turner, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from stopping, standing, or parking a vehicle that is not a plug-in electric drive vehicle in a parking space that is designated for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles; requiring that a parking space for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles have green pavement markings; requiring that a parking space for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles be counted as part of the overall number of parking spaces for certain purposes; establishing a civil penalty of $50 for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0036 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-145.1, 21-1003.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM