Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation - County, Municipal Corporation, or County Board Retirees
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Anderton, Arentz, Beitzel, Jacobs, Krimm, Lierman, Mangione, McKay, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing certain retired employees of a county, municipal corporation, or county board to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits program under certain circumstances; and requiring the governing body of a county, municipal corporation, or county board to pay certain costs and to make certain determinations with regard to certain retirees under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0956
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation - County, Municipal Corporation, or County Board Retirees
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 9:37 AM