Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Carroll County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $38,250,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public facilities in Carroll County, including water and sewer projects, to finance loans for fire or emergency-related equipment, buildings, and other facilities of volunteer fire departments in the County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0461
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/10/2020 10:18 AM