Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified property tax credit for specified business entities that obtain specified new or expanded premises in a priority funding area in Charles County; providing for the amount and duration of the property tax credit; authorizing the governing body of Charles County to provide, by law, for specified matters relating to the tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0569
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {285062/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {285062/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Text - Chapter - Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM