Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures
Sponsored by
Delegate Boteler
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Declaring the intent of the General Assembly to codify a certain federal regulation concerning preemption of local regulation of amateur radio station antenna structures; requiring that an ordinance adopted by a county or municipality to regulate amateur radio station antenna structures may not preclude amateur radio communications, must accommodate amateur radio communications, and must constitute the minimum practicable regulation to accomplish the purpose of the ordinance; applying the Act to all counties and municipalities; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1225 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Local Government - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Government - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page