Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Statewide Reporting - 2-1-1 Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Atterbeary, Carr, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the duties of 2-1-1 Maryland to include serving as a statewide hotline for the reporting of child abuse and neglect; requiring that 2-1-1 Maryland accept reports of child abuse and neglect 7 days a week, 24 hours a day; requiring the Health and Human Services Board in consultation with the State Department of Human Resources to develop policies for the proper training of 2-1-1 Maryland service provider staff in responding to reports of child abuse and neglect; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0945
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Statewide Reporting - 2-1-1 Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Statewide Reporting - 2-1-1 Maryland
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-716 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM