Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support Guidelines - Revision
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais and Malone
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Revising the schedule of basic child support obligations used to calculate the amount of a child support award under the child support guidelines; authorizing a court, in determining whether the application of the child support guidelines would be unjust or inappropriate in a particular case, to consider whether an obligor's monthly obligation would leave the obligor with a monthly actual income below the 2019 federal poverty level for an individual; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0763
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Support Guidelines - Revision
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Support Guidelines - Revision
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Child Support Guidelines - Revision
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46A
Text - Third - Child Support Guidelines - Revision
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-201, 12-202, 12-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM