Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarlau, D. Barnes, Barron, Chang, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Frush, Glenn, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jackson, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Sanchez, Smith, Sydnor, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified counties and municipal corporations to enact a local law, on or before December 31, 2017, to authorize collective bargaining between the county or municipal corporation and a specified employee organization; authorizing specified counties and municipal corporations to enact a local law to authorize collective bargaining between the county or municipal corporation and a specified employee organization; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
(   4-701 through 4-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page