Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement Choice for the 21st Century Workforce
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Clark, Cluster, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Hornberger, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the State Retirement Choice Plan; authorizing specified individuals who are employed by specified participating employers on or after July 1, 2018, to become members of the State Retirement Choice Plan; prohibiting specified individuals from electing to participate in the State Retirement Choice Plan; requiring specified individuals to be enrolled in the Employees' Pension System if a specified election is not made; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to adopt regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0540
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Retirement Choice for the 21st Century Workforce
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Retirement Choice for the 21st Century Workforce
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-201, 2-509.2, 33-101 through 33-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM