Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas Facility
Sponsored by
Calvert County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Calvert County to enter into a payment in lieu of taxes agreement with the owner of a facility for the liquefaction of natural gas; requiring an agreement for payment in lieu of taxes to include specified provisions; providing that specified property of the owner of a natural gas facility is exempt from county property tax as provided in a payment in lieu of taxes agreement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0656
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Second Reading Passed 47
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-517, 9-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM