Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Angel, Barkley, Barron, Barve, Carr, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gutierrez, Hayes, Hixson, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Waldstreicher, Hammen, Hill, McMillan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the annual reporting requirement of the State Open Meetings Law Compliance Board to require the Board to identify the provisions of the Act violated by a public body, the number of times each provision has been violated, and identify each public body that has been found in violation of a provision of the Act; requiring the Board to post on the Maryland Open Meetings Act page of the Office of the Attorney General Web site the name of the public body and the opinion that describes the violation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0598
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {296484/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {296484/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101, 3-204, 3-211, 3-213 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM