Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey and Frush
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 755
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a specified pollinator habitat plan to include specified best management practices for the designation of specified habitat areas; requiring that a specified pollinator habitat plan established by the Department of Natural Resources, the Maryland Environmental Service, and the State Highway Administration be as protective of pollinators as the Department of Agriculture's managed pollinator protection plan; prohibiting, with specified exceptions, the use of specified pesticides, seeds, or plants in a specified area; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0386
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirement and Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {530910/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614138/1
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614138/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {233923/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {113721/1 (Senator Middleton) Rejected (19-26)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-20)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 755
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirement and Prohibition
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {530910/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {614138/1 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 60
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {614138/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {233923/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {113721/1 (Senator Middleton) Rejected (19-26) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (115-20) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 755
Text - Chapter - Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM