Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Collection of Fees, Charges, Penalties, and Assessments
Sponsored by
Washington County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Washington County to include, for the purpose of collection, unpaid allocation fees, water and sewerage charges, penalties, and assessments on annual tax bills; and requiring that the fees, charges, penalties, and assessments be collected in the same manner as ordinary taxes, subject to the same interest and penalty for nonpayment as provided by law for the nonpayment of county taxes.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0518
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed 47
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM