Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the purpose of the Partnership for Workforce Quality Program and the eligible uses of grants under the Program to include training for new employees; providing that at least 60% of the money available is reserved for employers with 150 or fewer employees in the State, and up to 20% of the available money is for employers with more than 150 but less than 500 employees; establishing that a maximum of $200,000 of the money available may be provided to an employer with 500 employees based in the State under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0026
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {973195/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {973195/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Rules 46
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Rereferred to Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-401, 3-402, 3-403, 3-405, 3-412 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:08 PM