Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow Trucks
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a properly registered tow truck to be driven in a high occupancy vehicle lane at all times regardless of the number of passengers in the vehicle while responding to a call for service if the tow truck has been authorized by an appropriate law enforcement agency to use high occupancy vehicle lanes.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow Trucks
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow Trucks
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {413624/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow Trucks
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow Trucks
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow Trucks
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow Trucks
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 47
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Floor Amendment {413624/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow Trucks
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow Trucks
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM