Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora, Barkley, Barnes, Braveboy, Glenn, Hucker, and Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a merchant from using a wireless Internet signal or a cellular phone to monitor the behavior or shopping habits of a specified consumer unless the merchant displays at each entrance to the merchant's business premises a specified notice in a specified manner; providing that a violation of the Act is an unfair or deceptive trade practice under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act and is subject to specified enforcement and penalty provisions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0950
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Bates) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-47)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate Bates) Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (88-47) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Finance 45
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1324 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM