Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegates Hough and Cluster
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of a hearing board under the State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights to require that at least one member be of the same rank as the correctional officer against whom the complaint is filed.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Barnes) Adopted 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Finance 45
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM