Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Snack Food - Application
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that the exemption from the sales and use tax for food sold for consumption off the premises by specified food vendors does not apply to specified snack food; repealing the exemption from the sales and use tax for specified snack food sold through a vending machine; and defining the term "snack food".
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM