Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti, Brooks, Carey, Fennell, Jackson, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that the appropriate authority of a local pension system offer a special disability retirement allowance to certain members under certain circumstances; providing for the calculation of a special disability retirement allowance; exempting the appropriate authority of a local pension system from the requirements of the Act under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {934968/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {934968/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Referred Rules 62
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM