Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a landlord that requires a tenant to make payments for water or sewer utility services to the landlord to use a written lease that includes a notice that the tenant is responsible for making payments for water or sewer utility services to the landlord and to provide a copy of a certain water or sewer bill to a tenant; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0468
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {120819/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {988575/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-7)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {120819/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {988575/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (39-7) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM