Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – Health and Safety Best Practices – Digital Devices
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz, Adams, Anderton, Beitzel, Brooks, Buckel, Chang, Clark, Clippinger, Cluster, Corderman, Ebersole, Folden, Ghrist, Hettleman, Hornberger, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Lafferty, R. Lewis, Lierman, Mautz, McDonough, Metzgar, W. Miller, Patterson, Rose, Shoemaker, Tarlau, Vogt, West, Wilson, and Jackson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, by June 1, 2019, to develop health and safety best practices for the use of digital devices in school classrooms; and requiring the Department, by July 1, 2019, to provide the best practices to each county board and nonpublic school for consideration and adoption.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {855867/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Health and Safety Guidelines and Procedures - Digital Devices
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {855867/1 Adopted 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Public Schools – Health and Safety Best Practices – Digital Devices
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Referred Rules 57
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Text - Chapter - Public Schools – Health and Safety Best Practices – Digital Devices
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-441 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM