Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman and Busch
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Joint Audit Committee to be the Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee and altering its powers and duties; establishing the Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability in the Department of Legislative Services; requiring the Office to conduct certain performance evaluations of certain units of State government; requiring the Office to conduct certain investigations under certain circumstances; altering the manner in which certain governmental units are evaluated under the Maryland Program Evaluation Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0640
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations and House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {934869/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations and House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {934869/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 47
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Rules 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53A
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Text - Chapter - State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1206, 2-1230 through 2-1241, 2-1234 through 2-1241, 2-1243 through 2-1249, 2-1247, 2-1251, 2-1256, 2-601, 2-602, 2-605, 8-401, 8-402, 8-403, 8-404, 8-405 through 8-409, 8-408, 8-410, 8-411 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM