Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Chang, Krimm, Lisanti, McComas, A. Miller, Moon, and Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to develop and make available a standardized form for a BSL-3 laboratory for specified purposes; requiring the laboratories to report specified information to the Department on or before September 30, 2018, and on or before September 30 each subsequent year; requiring the Department to report, on or before December 31, 2018, and on or before December 31 each subsequent year, the number and location of the laboratories, in total and by local jurisdiction, to specified State officials; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0400
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0700 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Text - Third - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM