Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Established
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of a county or of a municipal corporation to grant a tax credit against the property tax imposed on the dwelling house of certain disabled veterans; establishing a tax credit against the State property tax on the dwelling house of certain disabled veterans; providing for the calculation of the credit; requiring certain disabled veterans to provide certain documents when applying for the credits under the Act; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Established
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:23 PM
Click to return on the top page