Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - University System of Maryland)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Approving specified projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of specified academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; authorizing the University System of Maryland to issue bonds in a total principal amount of $37,500,000 to finance and refinance specified renewal projects; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0821
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274265/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Jones) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator DeGrange) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments {274265/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 56
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator DeGrange) Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Referred Budget and Taxation 56
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM