Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Valderrama, Barron, Carey, Dumais, Gaines, Gilchrist, Healey, Jackson, Kaiser, Krimm, Lehman, McComas, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, Reznik, and Solomon
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain recipients of State funds to install an assistive listening system in an assembly area during construction or renovation of the assembly area if the assembly area uses or requires the use of a public address system and a state contract has been executed; authorizing certain recipients of State funds to apply for a waiver from the requirement of a certain provision of the Act; requiring that the waiver request include a certain description; establishing the Hearing Accessibility Advisory Board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1014
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244864/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {244864/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted 59A
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed 59A
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Text - Chapter - Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM