Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Forests and Parks - Public Recreation on Private and State-Owned Land - Hunting
Sponsored by
Delegates Clark, Chang, Fisher, S. Howard, Jackson, Jameson, Morgan, Otto, Patterson, Rey, Sophocleus, Vallario, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 746
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding a specified liability exemption for a landowner who agrees to the use of a defined part of the landowner's property for cross-country skiing or off-highway vehicle use to apply to hunting.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-5)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 746
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Forests and Parks - Public Recreation on Private and State-Owned Land - Hunting
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Text - Third - Forests and Parks - Public Recreation on Private and State-Owned Land - Hunting
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-5) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 746
Text - Chapter - Forests and Parks - Public Recreation on Private and State-Owned Land - Hunting
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-411, 5-1101, 5-1104, 5-1106, 5-1108, 5-1109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM