Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Law Enforcement Officer – Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial and Equity Impact note – 2021 Maryland Police Reform Proposals
Synopsis
Requiring certain law enforcement agencies to report by March 1, 2022, and each March 1 thereafter, certain information to the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services regarding law enforcement officer-involved incidents that resulted in a monetary settlement or judgment against the law enforcement agency; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to adopt certain procedures and compile and report certain information to the General Assembly by June 30 each year; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety – Law Enforcement Officer – Data Collection and Reporting
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/2/2021 12:59 PM
Click to return on the top page