Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Sponsored by
The Speaker and Delegates Sample-Hughes, D. Barnes, Haynes, Anderson, Boyce, Conaway, Holmes, McIntosh, Mosby, Valentino-Smith, Wells, and Fennell
Status
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish a certain new unit to assist in evaluating and reviewing certain proposals for new programs and substantial modifications of existing programs; requiring the Governor, in each of fiscal years 2023 through 2031, to include in the annual State operating budget $57,700,000 to be allocated to certain historically black colleges and universities; establishing the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Reserve Fund; specifying the purpose and uses of the Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1043
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 6 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664763/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-2)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/8 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {664763/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-2) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/8 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
(   10-214, 11-206.3, 15-126, 15-127 )
Last Updated: 2/9/2021 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page