Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup on Cancer Clusters and Environmental Causes of Cancer
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Anderson, Bromwell, Carter, Conaway, Cullison, Frush, Hubbard, Kach, A. Kelly, Mitchell, Morhaim, Murphy, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Stukes, Tarrant, M. Washington, Hammen, Pendergrass, Kipke, McDonough, Nathan-Pulliam, Elliott, Frank, Ready, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Department of the Environment, to convene a workgroup to examine issues relating to the investigation of potential cancer clusters in the State and potential environmental causes of cancer; specifying issues to be examined; requiring the workgroup to include specified legislators and representatives; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to report findings and recommendations of the workgroup on or before June 30, 2014; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0380
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1407 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {206984/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {206984/1 Report Adopted 60A
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60A
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 61
Senate 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM